CA AB3247 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1281.2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to arbitration.
Title
Arbitration: agreements: enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3247 JUD (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 3247 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 3247 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5037.). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5169.) |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |