CA AB324 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 731 and 733 of, and to add Section 1752.16 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Juvenile offenders: recall of commitment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Assembly - AB 324 BUCHANAN Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB324 Buchanan Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - AB 324 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB324 Buchanan Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - AB 324 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-02-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-02-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2012-02-23 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 3795.). | |
2012-02-21 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3771.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (February 21). | |
2012-02-17 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-02-17 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2818.). | |
2012-02-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-02-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 13). | |
2012-02-09 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (February 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-02-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-02 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-01 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-01-31 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-07-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-06-21 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-25 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 1038.) | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-03-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2011-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15817.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1752.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 733 | Amended Code | Citation Text |