CA AB3231 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1771.2 and 3073.5 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: public works: apprenticeship.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3231 GRAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3231 Gray By Cannella (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 3231 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3231 Gray By Cannella (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 3231 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 6983.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 29). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6647.) |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5512.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5008.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1771.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3073.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |