CA AB3217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1770 of the Civil Code, relating to advertising.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal services: advertising.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3217 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5208.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code17539.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code17539.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code1770Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44257.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback