CA AB320 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11166.4 to the Penal Code, and to amend Section 18961.7 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child abuse.
Title
Child Advocacy Centers.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11166.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18961.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |