CA AB3194 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65589.5 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing Accountability Act: project approval.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 3194 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3194 Daly By Skinner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 3194 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3194 Daly By Skinner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 3194 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6246.). |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5234.). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 5588.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5435.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5434.) |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 9). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65589.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |