CA AB3163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 650 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: biomethane: procurement.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3163 Salas et al. By Hueso (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3163 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3163 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 4405.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 11. Page 4693.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 2). |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 650 | Amended Code | Citation Text |