CA AB3162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 775, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11834.31 and 11834.34 of, and to repeal and add Sections 11834.09 and 11834.10 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to alcoholism or drug abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholism or drug abuse treatment facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3162 FRIEDMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3162 Friedman et al. By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 3162 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 775, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6788.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5803.).
2018-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5301.)
2018-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11834.09New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11834.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11834.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11834.31Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11834.34Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback