CA AB3145 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16000 and 16100 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend and renumber Section 65940.1 of, to amend Sections 37101, 53340, and 66477 of, and to add Chapter 4.10 (commencing with Section 65999) to Division 1 of Title 7 of, the Government Code, and to amend Section 7284 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: housing development projects: fees and exactions cap.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 16000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 16100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65940.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65999 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7284 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3145 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3145 |