CA AB3134 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-06 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-06 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5097, 5104, 5105, and 5151 of, and to add Sections 5086.2, 5108, and 5109 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to property taxation.
Title
Property taxation: refunds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3134 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3134 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5086.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5097 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |