CA AB3121 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 912 and 917 of, and to add Article 9.5 (commencing with Section 1048) to Chapter 4 of Division 8 of, the Evidence Code, relating to privilege.
Title
Evidentiary privileges: union agent-represented worker privilege.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 3121 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 3121 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 22. Page 4891.) |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 17). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1048 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Evidence Code | 912 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 917 | Amended Code | Citation Text |