CA AB3106 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 15 (commencing with Section 9255) to Division 5 of the Labor Code, relating to safety in employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School employees: COVID-19 cases: protections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2024-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2024-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2024-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2024-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code9255New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback