CA AB3101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18410.3 to, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.9 and 23622.9 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: California New Markets Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18410.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23622.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |