CA AB31 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8547.5 of the Government Code, relating to whistleblowers.
Title
Whistleblowers: California State Auditor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 31 Rodriguez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB31 Rodriguez By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 31 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB31 Rodriguez By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 31 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3520.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2938.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1486.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8547.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8547.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |