CA AB309 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 33, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 33, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6300 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts.
Title
Testamentary additions to trusts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB309 Maienschein By Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 309 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 309 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 33, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1486.). |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 723.) |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 6300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |