CA AB3080 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12953 to the Government Code, and to add Sections 432.4 and 432.6 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment discrimination: enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3080 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Jackson (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3080 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3080 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5592.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 5544.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12953 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 2814 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 432.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 432.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |