CA AB306 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 49, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 49, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17283.5 and 81050.5 to the Education Code, and to add Section 4454.5 to the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
School districts and community college districts: employee housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB306 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 306 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 306 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 49, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1633.). |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1250.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17283.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 81050.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 4454.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |