CA AB3042 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Santiago.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 37220 and 45203 of, and to add Section 37220.8 to, the Education Code, relating to school holidays.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School holidays: “International Workers’ Day” and “Presidents’ Day.”

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 3042 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Santiago.
2018-06-04AssemblyReconsideration granted. (Page 5693.)
2018-05-10AssemblyMotion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Santiago.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 27.).
2018-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 25).
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 21).
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code37220Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code37220.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code45203Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback