CA AB302 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 120266, 120267, and 120269 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
San Diego Metropolitan Transit Development Board: regulation of for-hire vehicle and passenger jitney services.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Assembly - AB 302 Ward Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB302 Ward (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - AB 302 Ward Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB302 Ward (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - AB 302 Ward Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2121.). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1632.). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 932.) |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 120266 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 120267 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 120269 | Amended Code | Citation Text |