CA AB3017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6836 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to medical supplies, and making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Qualified medical supplies providers: sales taxes: repayment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 3017 ACOSTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 3017 ACOSTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4791.) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6836 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 1808.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |