CA AB3001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25402.1 of, and to add Section 25403 to, the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 380.7 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Zero-emissions buildings and sources of heat energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25402.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 12819 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 16480 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 380.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 380.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3001 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3001 |