CA AB30 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 939, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 939, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 1.5 (commencing with Section 1000) to the Public Resources Code, relating to the environment.
Title
Equitable Outdoor Access Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 30 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB30 Kalra et al. By Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 30 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB30 Kalra et al. By Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 30 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 939, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 11.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5100.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 3433.) |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 1000 | New Code | See Bill Text |