CA AB2980 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26001 and 26051.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: premises: common space.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2980 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2980 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2980 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6909.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5901.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5569.) |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5567.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 5207.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26051.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |