CA AB2974 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14838.1 of the Government Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Small Business Procurement and Contract Act: federal Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2974 J., E.D., & E . (Cervantes) By Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2974 Jobs, Economic Developme Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CERVANTES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2974 J., E.D., & E . (Cervantes) By Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2974 J., E.D. & E. Assembly Third Reading By CERVANTES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2974 Jobs, Economic Developme Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CERVANTES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2974 J., E.D., & E . (Cervantes) By Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2974 J., E.D. & E. Assembly Third Reading By CERVANTES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5239.). |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4878.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 22. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14838.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |