CA AB297 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1204.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care facilities.
Title
Primary care clinics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - AB 297 CHESBRO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB297 Chesbro By DeSaulnier (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 297 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB297 Chesbro By DeSaulnier (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 297 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2905.). |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2092.). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2013-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1223.) |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1204.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |