CA AB2955 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10201, 10202, 10212, 10213, 10223, 10224, 10230, 10235, 10239, 10246, 10251, 10252, and 10255 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 10230) of Division 10.2 of, to amend the heading of Division 10.2 (commencing with Section 10200) of, to add Sections 10213.5, 10215.3, 10215.5, 10221.5, 10223.5, and 10231.3 of, and to repeal Sections 10234 and 10244 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to agricultural land.
Title
Agricultural land conservation: California Farmland Conservancy Program Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and NAT. RES. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2955 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2955 |