CA AB2952 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12811 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Driver’s licenses: veteran designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and TRANS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |