CA AB2945 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53993 of, and to add Title 23 (commencing with Section 100600) to, the Government Code, relating to redevelopment.
Title
Reconnecting Communities Redevelopment Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | (Pending re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D.) |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4775.) |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |