CA AB292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10608.12, 10633, 13263.7, 13561, 13561.2, 13570, and 13578 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Recycled water: raw water and groundwater augmentation.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 292 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 292 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1508.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10608.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10633 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13263.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13561 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13561.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13570 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13578 | Amended Code | Citation Text |