CA AB2918 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1656.3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: driver’s handbook.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2918 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2918 Holden By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2918 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 7.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5884.).
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 4. Page 5255.)
2018-05-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code1656.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code21376Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback