CA AB2910 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42402, 42402.1, and 42411 of, and to add Section 42405.7 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Nonvehicular air pollution: civil penalties.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2910 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2910 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 17.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 18). |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 42402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42402.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42405.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42411 | Amended Code | Citation Text |