CA AB2898 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8630 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: local emergencies.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2898 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2898 Gloria By McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2898 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2898 Gloria By McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2898 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6377.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5292.). |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5219.) |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |