CA AB2890 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 36615.5 and 36622 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to improvement districts.
Title
Property and business improvement districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2890 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2890 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2890 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4573.). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4820.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4568.) |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 36615.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 36622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |