CA AB2889 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8386.7 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Wildfire mitigation plans: electrical infrastructure: hardening.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 8386.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |