CA AB2884 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 285, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 285, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10001, 10016, 10027, 10050, 10131, 10133.1, 10133.2, 10137, 10140.6, 10142, 10143.5, 10144, 10158, 10159, 10159.6, 10159.7, 10164, 10176, 10177, 10178, 10179, 10186.2, 10232.3, 10238, 10243, 10509, 10561, 11212, and 11267 of, to add Sections 10010.5, 10015.1, 10015.2, 10015.3, 10015.4, 10015.5, 10018.01, 10018.02, 10018.03, 10018.04, 10018.05, 10018.06, 10018.07, 10018.08, 10018.09, 10018.10, 10018.11, 10018.13, 10018.14, 10018.15, 10018.16, and 10018.17 to, to repeal Sections 10132 and 10160 of, and to repeal and add Section 10161.8 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate.
Title
Real estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2884 IRWIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2884 Irwin By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2884 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2884 Irwin By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2884 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-06 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 285, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-09-06 | Senate | style="text-align:left">Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5454.). |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.lign:left">Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5217.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |