CA AB2883 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3351 and 3352 of, and to repeal Section 6354.7 of, the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2883 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By DALY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2883 Committee On INS. (Daly) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2883 INS. Assembly Third Reading By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2883 Committee On INS. (Daly) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2883 INS. Assembly Third Reading By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5817.). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4871.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5113.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3351 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6354.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 77.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |