CA AB2876 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 11.6 (commencing with Section 50810) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to veterans housing.
Title
Veterans housing: assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and V.A. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50810 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |