CA AB2874 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8387.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Fire prevention: electrical utility facilities and maintenance: liability of contractors.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 8387.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |