CA AB2870 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 974, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 974, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18150, 18170, and 18190 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: gun violence restraining orders.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2870 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2870 Santiago et al. By Stern (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2870 Santiago Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2870 Santiago et al. By Stern (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2870 Santiago Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 974, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 14.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29). |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.) |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 4956.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5036.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 18150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |