CA AB2866 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.8 (commencing with Section 44269) to Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Vehicular air pollution: Clean Fleet Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44269 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2866 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2866 |