CA AB2853 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 53083.1 to the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: economic development subsidies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 2853 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2853 Medina By Leyva (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2853 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-08-29 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-28 Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-16 In Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-08-16 Action rescinded whereby bill was ordered to enrollment and whereby the bill was enrolled and presented to the Governor.
2018-08-16 Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6208.).
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 5103.).
2018-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 5203.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5094.)
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 25).
2018-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53083Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53083.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback