CA AB285 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 426, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 426, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51210 and 51220 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: science requirements: climate change.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Lisa Calderon [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] |
Asm. Chris Ward [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 285 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB285 Luz Rivas et al. By Cortese (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 285 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB285 Luz Rivas et al. By Cortese (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 285 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 426, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 3379.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2644.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 2. Page 1483.) |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 19). |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |