CA AB2824 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15372 of, and to add Sections 15151.5, 19204.7, and 19216.5 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: precinct reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 13). |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 15151.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 15372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19204.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 19216.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |