CA AB2820 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 396 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: price gouging: states of emergency.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2820 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2820 Chiu By Pavley (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2820 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2820 Chiu By Pavley (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2820 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 11. Page 6347.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 5286.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 10. Page 4724.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (May 4). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 396 | Amended Code | Citation Text |