CA AB2806 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 915, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 915, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8243 of, to add Article 24 (commencing with Section 8489) to Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, and to repeal Section 8222 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 1596.893c of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10281 of, to add Section 10281.2 to, and to add Chapter 33 (commencing with Section 10491) to Part 1.8 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Childcare and developmental services: preschool: expulsion and suspension: mental health services: reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2806 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2806 Blanca Rubio et al. By Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2806 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2806 Blanca Rubio et al. By Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2806 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 915, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5216.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-10 | Senate | 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022 |
2022-06-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED., HUMAN S. and HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5017.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8222 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8243 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8489 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.893 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10281.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |