CA AB2805 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 356, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 356, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 361.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: reunification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2805 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2805 Eggman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2805 Eggman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 356, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4373.). |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |