CA AB2797 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 9360) to Part 3 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Decarbonizing Fuels Incentive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and TRANS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 9360 | New Code | See Bill Text |