CA AB2794 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25205.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste: facilities permitting: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1569.311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25150.84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25189.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25205.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25205.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25205.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25247 | Amended Code | Citation Text |