CA AB2794 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Enrolled on August 2 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-05 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 2 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-05 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 16.5 (commencing with Section 98020) to, to repeal Sections 12012.25, 12012.30, 12012.35, 12012.40, 12012.45, 12012.46, 12012.465, 12012.47, 12012.475, 12012.48, 12012.485, 12012.49, 12012.495, 12012.5, 12012.51, 12012.515, 12012.52, 12012.53, 12012.75, 12012.85, and 12012.90 of, to repeal Chapter 7.5 (commencing with Section 12710) of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 98055) of Title 16.5 of, the Government Code, relating to gaming.
Title
Tribal gaming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2794 Committee on G.O. (Price) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2794 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2794 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-05 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2010-08-05 | Ordered returned to Senate. | |
2010-08-02 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4310.) | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 29). | |
2010-06-10 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-05-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5162.) | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-03-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. | |
2010-03-17 | Read first time. To print. |