CA AB2774 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 877, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 597.9 of the Penal Code, relating to animal abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal shelters: adoption application: crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2774 LIMÓN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2774 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2774 LIMÓN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 877, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6872.).
2018-08-27AssemblyOrdered to the unfinished business file.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2018-08-27SenateOrdered to the Assembly.
2018-07-02SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2018-07-02AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2018-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.).
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4828.)
2018-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code597.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code600.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code600.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code600.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback